open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:4:17-cv-04070
    Party Name:Caskey v. South Dakota State Penitentiary et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:August 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Error]
    Date Published:May 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:January 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Party]
    Date Published:December 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:December 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:December 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter Sent]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter Received]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Material Facts]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?54171
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =