open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:1:13-cr-10037-1
    Party Name:USA v. End of Horn
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript of Voir Dire]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal Record Returned]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Opinion]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?53009
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =