open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:5:13-cv-05042
    Party Name:Tinant v. Rapid Chevrolet Co. Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Motion]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?52964
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =