open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:1:14-cv-01006
    Party Name:Gonsalves et al v. Adams et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Settlement]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral Order]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service Executed]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?54651
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =