open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:4:13-cv-04051
    Party Name:Bettor Racing, Inc. v. National Indian Gaming Commission et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal Record Returned]
    Date Published:July 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:April 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Opinion]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter Sent]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?52807
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =