open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:4:13-cr-40141-2
    Party Name:USA v. Bruguier et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Termination of Supervision]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Opinion]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Order of Detention]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Finding of Probable Cause]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Redacted]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Redaction Request]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Public]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Restricted]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:December 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Verdict (Redacted)]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Verdict]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Question]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial - Completed]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial - Continuation]
    Date Published:November 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Subpoena(s)]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury List]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial - Began]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:November 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Subpoena Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:November 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:November 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:November 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
    Date Published:November 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exclude]
    Date Published:November 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine]
    Date Published:November 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Subpoena Issued]
    Date Published:October 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:October 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:October 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice]
    Date Published:October 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:August 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:August 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:August 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:August 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Superseding]
    Date Published:August 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:August 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:July 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:July 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:July 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Produce ]
    Date Published:July 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
    Date Published:May 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:April 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:March 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Addendum to Bail Report]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:October 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:October 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Discovery]
    Date Published:October 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery]
    Date Published:October 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:October 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Early Termination]
    Date Published:October 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Early Termination]
    Date Published:October 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
    Date Published:October 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Recommended Special Conditions]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Order]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Allocution Statement]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Oral Motion]
    Date Published:December 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Revocation]
    Date Published:November 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:November 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:July 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:July 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Johnson Claim - Motion to Reduce Sentence (filed in Civil Case)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Variance]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Departure]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Departure]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Variance]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Presentence Report]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing Error]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Allocution Statement]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Draft Presentence Report]
    Date Published:March 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pre-Sentence Payment]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extend]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Informed Consent to Continuance]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Furlough]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Review Hearing]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Invocation of Rights]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:April 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Downward Departure]
    Date Published:June 27, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Factual Basis]
    Date Published:June 09, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:May 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Furlough]
    Date Published:May 14, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?48145
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =