open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:4:14-cr-40058-2
    Party Name:USA v. Solberg et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
    Date Published:October 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Early Termination]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Early Termination]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?54699
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =