open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:5:14-cv-05026
    Party Name:Goldstein v. Giist et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?54574
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =