open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:4:19-cr-40084-1
    Party Name:USA v. Mathison
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Draft Presentence Report]
    Date Published:July 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Factual Basis]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Informed Consent to Continuance]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Order to Change Victim]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing Error]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Order to Change Victim (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Redacted Document]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 09, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Motion Response]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Change Victim]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?21116
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =