open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:13-40693
    Party Name:Kelly Lee Mayo
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
    Date Published:September 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:June 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
    Date Published:June 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
    Date Published:June 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:June 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Vacating Order]
    Date Published:June 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
    Date Published:June 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case (Text Order) Ch 13]
    Date Published:June 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:May 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47684
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =