open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:10-40574
    Party Name:David Dean Pfannes and Lisa Marie Pfannes
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:September 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service on Trustee Wein (Text Entry)]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:August 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
    Date Published:August 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?41833
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =