open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:14-40062
    Party Name:Steven Arthur Schneider and Katherine Marie Schneider
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge (Ch 11/13)]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver)(fee required)]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47890
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =