open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:14-10046
    Party Name:Donald Orson Bucklin, Jr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Exhibits Destroyed]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
    Date Published:January 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
    Date Published:January 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appeal Order - BAP re: Appeal]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Transcript]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approve Agreement under Rule 9019 (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Acknowledgement of Request for Transcript of Testimony]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Transcript]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reply]
    Date Published:September 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (fee required)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appeal - Transmittal to BAP (Text Entry)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appeal - Acknowledgment of Docketing Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
    Date Published:September 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Administrative Expense]
    Date Published:September 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:July 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?48052
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =