open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:14-50026
    Party Name:Chad Christopher Hanson and Traci Marie Hanson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
    Date Published:January 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
    Date Published:November 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Report of Returned Funds/New Estate Funds]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Report of Sale]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Application 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Professional]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47823
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =