open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:14-30017
    Party Name:Daniel Thomas Gargan and Mary Turgeon Wynne
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case (Text Order) Ch 13]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?48071
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =