open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:18-40545
    Party Name:Jeremy Clayton Spruiell
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Certified Copy]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reaffirmation Agreement (Includes signature of Debtor's attorney)]
    Date Published:December 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:December 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
    Date Published:December 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:December 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Dismissal]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Order]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Show Cause in Lieu of Dismissal]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee(s) (Individual)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Intention]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47241
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =