open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:14-40230
    Party Name:Michael John Hench and Angelica Marie Hench
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement re: Undeliverable or Returned Mail]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge (Ch 11/13)]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:October 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
    Date Published:September 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (with waiver)(fee required)]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:July 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?48193
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =