open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:14-40014
    Party Name:Cindy Lou Larson Schaap
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
    Date Published:September 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47774
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =