open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:13-10193
    Party Name:Dana David Bevers
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case (Text Order) Ch 13]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:September 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver)(fee required)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47704
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =