open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:11-10081
    Party Name:Ronald Vaughn McMurtry and Sharon Louise McMurtry
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Certified Copy]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 12 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:August 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor(s) Final Report and Account (Chapter 12)]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor(s) Final Report (12)]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of No Objection (Text Entry)]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43374
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =