U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cv-04183
  • Case Name: Integro Services Group, Inc. v. SWI Energy, L.L.C.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 07, 2019: [Text Order]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Certificate]
  • March 25, 2019: [Proposed Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Affidavit]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • January 04, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 04, 2018: [Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 12, 2016: [Certificate]
  • August 12, 2016: [Dismiss Party]
  • August 09, 2016: [Status Report]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order Lifting Stay]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • June 10, 2016: [Notice]
  • June 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Status Report]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 21, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • March 21, 2016: [Notice]
  • March 11, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • March 10, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2015
  • November 11, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2014
  • June 16, 2014: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.