U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04030
  • Case Name: Erickson v. Larson Auto World, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Judgment]
  • July 28, 2015: [Jury Trial Held (One Day Trial)]
  • July 28, 2015: [Jury Question]
  • July 28, 2015: [Redacted Document]
  • July 28, 2015: [Verdict]
  • July 28, 2015: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • July 28, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • July 28, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 28, 2015: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 13, 2015: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2015: [Pretrial Submissions]
June, 2014
  • June 17, 2014: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.