U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cv-04121
  • Case Name: Argus Leader Media v. United States Department of Agriculture
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 04, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Proposed Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 21, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 21, 2019: [Brief]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 03, 2019: [Extend]
  • October 02, 2019: [Extend]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 16, 2019: [New Trial]
  • September 16, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 16, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 05, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 03, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Appeal Record Returned]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 07, 2018: [USCA Order]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [USCA Order]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [USCA Order]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 08, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • August 02, 2017: [Costs Taxed]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 20, 2017: [Transmittal of Documents]
  • June 18, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 18, 2017: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • June 18, 2017: [Transcript]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 04, 2017: [Response]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 03, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 01, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 26, 2017: [Leave to]
  • April 21, 2017: [Reply]
  • April 21, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • April 20, 2017: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 01, 2017: [Leave to]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Response]
  • March 31, 2017: [Declaration]
  • March 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 29, 2017: [Transmittal of Documents]
  • March 27, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 15, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2017: [Extend]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 16, 2017: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • February 15, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 15, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • February 14, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 14, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • February 14, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 10, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 07, 2017: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • February 03, 2017: [Declaration]
  • February 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 03, 2017: [Bond]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • January 30, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 27, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 27, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 27, 2017: [Intervene]
  • January 23, 2017: [Compel]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 04, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 30, 2016: [Extend]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 16, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
  • December 16, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • December 14, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2016: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Response]
  • July 26, 2016: [Reply]
  • July 20, 2016: [Brief]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 28, 2016: [Transcript]
  • June 22, 2016: [Trial Brief]
  • June 19, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 19, 2016: [Transcript]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 16, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 09, 2016: [Extend]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • May 25, 2016: [Court Trial - Completed]
  • May 25, 2016: [Court Trial - Began]
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 23, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 20, 2016: [Extend]
  • May 19, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 17, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 17, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • May 17, 2016: [Leave to]
  • May 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 12, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 11, 2016: [Pretrial Submissions]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • February 12, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 10, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 15, 2016: [Continue]
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2015: [Reply]
  • December 02, 2015: [Declaration]
  • December 02, 2015: [Proposed Schedule]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Proposed Schedule]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2014
  • June 18, 2014: [Order on Motion to Extend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.