U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cv-05050
  • Case Name: United States for the Use and Benefit of Simon Contractors of South Dakota, Inc. v. S
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 05, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Proposed Order]
  • January 15, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 15, 2016: [Consolidate Cases]
  • January 15, 2016: [Notice]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 16, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 16, 2015: [Extend]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • September 14, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2014
  • June 23, 2014: [Extend Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.