U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04040
  • Case Name: Miller v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Supplement]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 07, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • July 27, 2015: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 27, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reverse]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • July 13, 2015: [Judgment]
June, 2014
  • June 25, 2014: [Transcript - Social Security Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.