U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:13-cv-04100
  • Case Name: Graham v. State of South Dakota
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Letter Sent]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Appeal Record Returned]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 30, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Letter Sent]
  • February 06, 2018: [Letter Sent]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 13, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 12, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 12, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 12, 2016: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 22, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 21, 2016: [Supplement]
  • November 18, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 26, 2016: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
October, 2015
  • October 05, 2015: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
June, 2014
  • June 26, 2014: [Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.