U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04100
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Mayfield Hutterian Brethren, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 07, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 25, 2016: [Consent]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 11, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 19, 2015: [Declaration]
  • November 19, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 19, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 19, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 16, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 10, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • July 09, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • July 09, 2015: [Proposed Order]
June, 2014
  • June 27, 2014: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.