U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cv-05044
  • Case Name: LeBeau v. Progressive Northern Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 19, 2016: [Stipulation]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
June, 2014
  • June 30, 2014: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.