U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-01015
  • Case Name: Taggatz v. Codington County Detention Center
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [Mail Returned]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • July 23, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 23, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
June, 2014
  • June 30, 2014: [Supplement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.