U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04103
  • Case Name: McAllister-Lewis v. Goodyear Dunlop Tires North America, LTD. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 13, 2018: [Letter Received]
  • August 02, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 02, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Letter Received]
  • July 23, 2018: [Notice]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 27, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 27, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice]
  • May 29, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order]
  • May 22, 2018: [Letter Received]
  • May 22, 2018: [Objections to Deposition Designations]
  • May 22, 2018: [In Limine]
  • May 18, 2018: [Objection]
  • May 17, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • May 17, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 16, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 16, 2018: [Quash]
  • May 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 15, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order]
  • May 07, 2018: [Compel]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Brief]
  • February 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 15, 2018: [Reconsideration]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 21, 2017: [Strike]
  • August 08, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • August 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Supplement]
  • July 28, 2017: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • July 27, 2017: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • July 25, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 17, 2017: [Supplement]
  • July 17, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • July 05, 2017: [Jury List]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 27, 2017: [Transcript]
  • June 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 05, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 02, 2017: [Response]
  • June 02, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 02, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 24, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • May 22, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 22, 2017: [In Limine]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order]
  • May 12, 2017: [Objection]
  • May 08, 2017: [Reply]
  • May 05, 2017: [Pretrial Submissions]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 16, 2017: [In Limine]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Received]
  • February 02, 2017: [Response]
  • February 02, 2017: [Reply]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Response]
  • January 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 04, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 07, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 07, 2016: [Exclude]
  • December 06, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 06, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 06, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 06, 2016: [Exclude]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 18, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 18, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 15, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 21, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Supplement]
  • April 22, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 24, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 24, 2016: [Compel]
  • February 24, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 24, 2016: [Sanctions]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • February 01, 2016: [Compel]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 27, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 27, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 15, 2015: [Brief]
  • October 15, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
September, 2015
  • September 01, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 03, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • August 03, 2015: [Protective Order]
July, 2014
  • July 02, 2014: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.