U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04102
  • Case Name: Dale v. Dejong et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 06, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • January 10, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 09, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • December 02, 2016: [Remark]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 09, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 07, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order]
  • October 31, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 28, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • October 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 28, 2016: [Dismiss]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 21, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • June 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 23, 2016: [Declaration]
  • May 23, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 19, 2016: [Response]
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Joinder]
  • April 28, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 13, 2016: [Order]
  • April 05, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 21, 2016: [Declaration]
  • January 21, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 07, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • January 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • December 15, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 15, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 15, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 15, 2015: [Compel]
  • December 04, 2015: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 17, 2015: [Report and Recommendation]
  • November 13, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 13, 2015: [Declaration]
  • November 13, 2015: [Preliminary Injunction]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2015
  • September 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 24, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 15, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2015: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • July 09, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • July 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2014
  • July 02, 2014: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.