U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05042
  • Case Name: Fisher v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Settlement Conference]
  • August 26, 2015: [Settlement Agreement]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Notice]
  • July 27, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
July, 2014
  • July 07, 2014: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.