U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05043
  • Case Name: Becenti v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Letter Received]
  • May 02, 2016: [Letter Received]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 11, 2016: [Extend]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 29, 2015: [Dismiss]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 10, 2015: [Extend]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Certificate]
  • October 14, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 14, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 14, 2015: [Compel]
September, 2015
  • September 14, 2015: [Extend]
August, 2015
  • August 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
July, 2015
  • July 08, 2015: [Extend]
July, 2014
  • July 08, 2014: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.