U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:13-cv-04144
  • Case Name: Scheetz v. Kaemingk et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 08, 2018: [Dismiss]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 15, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 15, 2017: [Seal Existing Document]
  • December 08, 2017: [Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • December 07, 2017: [Response]
  • December 04, 2017: [In Limine]
  • December 04, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 04, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • December 04, 2017: [Pretrial Submissions]
  • December 04, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 04, 2017: [Bifurcate]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 25, 2017: [Response]
  • October 25, 2017: [Reply]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 18, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • October 16, 2017: [Letter]
  • October 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 05, 2017: [Response]
  • October 05, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 05, 2017: [Strike]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • September 15, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • September 15, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 15, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • June 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 22, 2017: [Leave to]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 03, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2017: [Withdraw]
  • March 24, 2017: [Withdraw]
  • March 23, 2017: [Withdraw]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 13, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 26, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • October 26, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 26, 2016: [Objection]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Letter Received]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Reply]
  • December 15, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 15, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 15, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 22, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 22, 2015: [Proposed Schedule]
  • October 22, 2015: [Extend]
  • October 20, 2015: [Briefing Schedule]
  • October 01, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • October 01, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 01, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Proposed Schedule]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 15, 2015: [Extend]
  • September 15, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 15, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 02, 2015: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • September 01, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • August 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 19, 2015: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • August 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 19, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 24, 2015: [Response]
July, 2014
  • July 11, 2014: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.