U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05005
  • Case Name: Anderson v. Northland Restaurant Group, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Response]
  • February 04, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 01, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 27, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • January 18, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
July, 2014
  • July 18, 2014: [Subpoena Returned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.