U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04111
  • Case Name: Bell v. Voight et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 22, 2016: [USCA Order]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 23, 2016: [USCA Opinion]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [USCA Order]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
November, 2015
  • November 27, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 05, 2015: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 05, 2015: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 15, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 09, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • September 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 09, 2015: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 09, 2015: [Judgment]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • July 23, 2015: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • July 02, 2015: [Temporary Restraining Order]
July, 2014
  • July 21, 2014: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.