U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05044
  • Case Name: Larmon v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 19, 2016: [Costs Taxed]
  • September 06, 2016: [Costs Taxed]
  • September 02, 2016: [Response]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 29, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • January 22, 2016: [Brief]
  • January 13, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • January 13, 2016: [Court Trial - Completed]
  • January 12, 2016: [Court Trial - Began]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • January 07, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Service]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 22, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 21, 2015: [Response]
  • December 21, 2015: [Objection]
  • December 21, 2015: [Redacted Document]
  • December 18, 2015: [Seal Existing Document]
  • December 18, 2015: [Response]
  • December 18, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 15, 2015: [Response]
  • December 14, 2015: [Notice]
  • December 14, 2015: [Supplement]
  • December 14, 2015: [Trial Brief]
  • December 14, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 14, 2015: [In Limine]
  • December 14, 2015: [Pretrial Submissions]
  • December 11, 2015: [Notice]
  • December 11, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 11, 2015: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2015: [Trial Brief]
  • December 11, 2015: [Pretrial Submissions]
July, 2014
  • July 21, 2014: [Acknowledgment of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.