U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04074
  • Case Name: Stock v. BNSF Railway Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Withdraw]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • September 28, 2016: [Brief]
  • September 28, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Reply]
  • June 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 13, 2016: [Exclude]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Supplement]
January, 2016
  • January 06, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 06, 2016: [Reply]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 23, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 23, 2015: [Response]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 20, 2015: [Brief]
  • November 20, 2015: [Designation of Expert Witness]
  • November 17, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 10, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • November 10, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 06, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2015: [Certificate]
  • November 05, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 05, 2015: [Brief]
  • November 05, 2015: [Protective Order]
  • November 05, 2015: [Hearing]
  • November 05, 2015: [Quash]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • October 30, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • October 30, 2015: [Brief]
  • October 30, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 28, 2015: [Brief]
  • September 28, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • September 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 10, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 04, 2015: [Compel]
  • September 04, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 04, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 27, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 27, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • July 29, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • July 24, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • July 14, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • July 14, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 13, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Order]
  • June 23, 2015: [Compel]
  • June 23, 2015: [Brief]
  • June 23, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • June 23, 2015: [Certificate]
July, 2014
  • July 21, 2014: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.