U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04112
  • Case Name: Watson-Miller v. Gibson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Settlement Agreement]
  • August 29, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2016: [Letter]
  • August 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • August 01, 2016: [Response]
  • August 01, 2016: [Brief]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Declaration]
  • June 24, 2016: [Reply]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • June 22, 2016: [Seal Existing Document]
  • June 21, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • June 14, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 10, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 10, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 10, 2016: [Response]
  • June 08, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Declaration]
  • May 20, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • May 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 20, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 18, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 18, 2016: [Compel]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 02, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2014
  • July 22, 2014: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.