U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04113
  • Case Name: National Music Museum: America's Shrine to Music v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Received]
  • October 05, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 14, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • June 26, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 22, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • June 22, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 22, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 14, 2017: [New Trial]
  • February 14, 2017: [Alter Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 23, 2017: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Trial Brief]
  • September 09, 2016: [Trial Brief]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 24, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 23, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 10, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • August 02, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 02, 2016: [Court Trial Held (One Day Trial)]
  • August 02, 2016: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Pretrial Submissions]
  • July 25, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice]
  • July 18, 2016: [Pretrial Submissions]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
  • July 06, 2016: [Bifurcate]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 21, 2015: [Response]
  • August 21, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 21, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 21, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • August 21, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Notice]
July, 2014
  • July 22, 2014: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.