U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04065
  • Case Name: Sorensen v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 07, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • September 10, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2015: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 01, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 01, 2015: [Bill of Costs]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reverse]
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • August 25, 2015: [Judgment]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Report and Recommendation]
July, 2014
  • July 28, 2014: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.