U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cv-05049
  • Case Name: Central States Fair v. Sutton Rodeos, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 19, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 19, 2016: [Dismiss]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order]
  • March 16, 2016: [Certificate]
  • March 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 04, 2016: [Strike]
  • March 01, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 29, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 29, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • February 29, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Reply]
  • October 15, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Leave to]
  • September 30, 2015: [Brief]
July, 2014
  • July 28, 2014: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.