U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-01018
  • Case Name: Northern Valley Communications, L.L.C. v. AT&T Corp.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 01, 2018: [Dismiss]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Statement]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • August 21, 2017: [Status Report]
  • August 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2017: [Affidavit in Support]
  • August 16, 2017: [Brief]
  • August 15, 2017: [Reply]
  • August 11, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 08, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 01, 2017: [Appendix]
  • August 01, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 01, 2017: [Response]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 27, 2017: [Strike]
  • July 26, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Redact Transcript]
  • July 18, 2017: [Affidavit in Support]
  • July 18, 2017: [Response]
  • July 18, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • July 18, 2017: [Brief]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 14, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 13, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 13, 2017: [Stay]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Appendix]
  • June 29, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • June 29, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 29, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2017: [Response]
  • June 16, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 16, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 09, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • June 09, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 08, 2017: [Leave to]
  • June 01, 2017: [Redact Transcript]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Redact Transcript]
  • May 19, 2017: [Redact Transcript]
  • May 19, 2017: [Response]
  • May 17, 2017: [Request]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 28, 2017: [Transcript]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Letter Received]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Reply]
  • August 08, 2016: [Response]
  • August 05, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 27, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 26, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 25, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 19, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • July 08, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 08, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2016: [Leave to]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 21, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 17, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2016: [Declaration]
  • June 17, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 17, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order]
  • June 16, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 10, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 25, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 06, 2016: [Proposed Order]
  • April 06, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 09, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • October 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 22, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2014
  • July 29, 2014: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.