U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04118
  • Case Name: Kobasic v. Yankton Medical Clinic, P.C.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • January 16, 2018: [Costs Taxed]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 20, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • June 20, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • June 20, 2016: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • June 20, 2016: [Verdict]
  • June 20, 2016: [Response]
  • June 20, 2016: [Jury Question]
  • June 20, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 17, 2016: [Jury Question]
  • June 16, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 16, 2016: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • June 15, 2016: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • June 14, 2016: [Jury List]
  • June 14, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 13, 2016: [Exclude]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order]
  • June 13, 2016: [Response]
  • June 09, 2016: [Objection]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order]
  • June 09, 2016: [Objections to Deposition Designations]
  • June 08, 2016: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • June 07, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 06, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 06, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 03, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 02, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 02, 2016: [Strike]
  • June 01, 2016: [Notice]
  • June 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Notice]
  • May 27, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 27, 2016: [Witness List]
  • May 27, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • May 27, 2016: [Jury List]
  • May 27, 2016: [Pretrial Submissions]
  • May 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 27, 2016: [In Limine]
  • May 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Notice]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice]
September, 2015
  • September 15, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 04, 2015: [Notice]
July, 2015
  • July 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 08, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2014
  • July 30, 2014: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.