U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:13-cv-04106
  • Case Name: Cochrun v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Mail Returned]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 01, 2019: [USCA Order]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 29, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 19, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 18, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2014
  • July 31, 2014: [USCA Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.