U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:10-cv-05089
  • Case Name: Highmark, Inc. v. Northwest Pipe Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 19, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 21, 2017: [Transcript]
  • February 06, 2017: [Letter Sent]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 06, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 05, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 03, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 27, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 22, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 22, 2016: [Court Reporter Information]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 01, 2016: [Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • November 17, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • November 17, 2016: [Response]
  • November 15, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • November 15, 2016: [Response]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order]
  • November 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 02, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2016: [Supplement]
  • November 01, 2016: [Response]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order]
  • October 26, 2016: [Strike]
  • October 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • October 21, 2016: [Reply]
  • October 17, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 17, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • October 14, 2016: [Response]
  • October 14, 2016: [Letter]
  • October 14, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • October 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 14, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order]
  • October 06, 2016: [Response]
  • October 05, 2016: [Response]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order]
  • October 03, 2016: [Response]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law]
  • September 30, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 30, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 30, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 30, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • September 30, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 30, 2016: [Response]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 22, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 21, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 16, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 13, 2016: [Response]
  • September 13, 2016: [Status Report]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • August 25, 2016: [Withdraw]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order for Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 16, 2016: [Exclude]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 30, 2016: [Response]
  • June 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 15, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • June 10, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 10, 2016: [Transcript]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 16, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 10, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Order]
  • April 08, 2016: [Status Report]
  • April 07, 2016: [Status Report]
  • April 05, 2016: [Status Report]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 01, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 14, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 14, 2015: [Reply]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • September 30, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 30, 2015: [Response]
  • September 30, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 30, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 29, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 29, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 13, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 13, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 13, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 13, 2015: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 13, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • August 11, 2015: [File Excess Pages]
  • August 05, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 05, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • August 05, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • August 05, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 05, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Notice]
  • July 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Joinder]
  • June 24, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2014
  • July 31, 2014: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.