U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:13-cv-04075
  • Case Name: General Casualty Company of Wisconsin v. Nelson Engineering Consulting, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 22, 2016: [Dismiss]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Status Report]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Status Report]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Reply]
  • March 21, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 17, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 17, 2016: [Transcript]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 03, 2016: [Proposed Order]
  • March 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Brief]
  • February 26, 2016: [Certificate]
  • February 26, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 26, 2016: [Stay]
  • February 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2016: [Certificate]
  • February 11, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 11, 2016: [Compel]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 14, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 06, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Response]
  • June 22, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 22, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2014
  • July 31, 2014: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.