U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cv-05008
  • Case Name: Jones v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 14, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 15, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • April 27, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 22, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2015
  • November 27, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2014
  • August 04, 2014: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.