U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cv-04061
  • Case Name: First Dakota National Bank v. BancInsure
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 17, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal (Attorney)]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Status Report]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Response]
  • February 03, 2017: [Status Report]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order]
August, 2014
  • August 04, 2014: [Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.