U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:13-cv-04133
  • Case Name: Henry Carlson Company v. Arch Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 14, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal (Attorney)]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2017: [Compel]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 09, 2017: [Stay]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 29, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 16, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 16, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 14, 2017: [Supplement]
  • August 14, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 01, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 10, 2017: [Objection]
  • July 07, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 07, 2017: [Designation of Expert Witness]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 05, 2017: [Proposed Order]
  • June 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines]
  • June 05, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order]
  • June 02, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 02, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • June 02, 2017: [Transcript]
  • June 01, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • June 01, 2017: [Response]
  • June 01, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 01, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2017: [Declaration]
  • May 26, 2017: [Brief]
  • May 26, 2017: [Enforce]
  • May 26, 2017: [In Limine]
  • May 24, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 24, 2017: [Proposed Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 10, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 10, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 09, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 09, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 09, 2017: [Declaration]
  • May 08, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • May 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 05, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 05, 2017: [Compel]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 19, 2017: [Compel]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 02, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • February 01, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 07, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [Judgment - Attorney Fees]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 01, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 01, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • November 10, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 10, 2015: [Response to Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Attorney Fees]
  • October 20, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 08, 2015: [Objection]
  • October 06, 2015: [Proposed Order]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 23, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Reply]
  • August 14, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • August 14, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 31, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 24, 2015: [Compel]
  • July 24, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 24, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 24, 2015: [Certificate]
August, 2014
  • August 05, 2014: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.